SC S1027 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 43-25-10 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Commission For The Blind, To Provide That Meetings Shall Be Held At Least Once A Quarter.
Title
Commission for the Blind
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |