SC S1019 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Reporting Of A Missing Child To The Appropriate Law Enforcement Agency And To Provide Penalties For Failure To Report.
Title
Caylee's Law
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] | Sen. Dick Elliott [D] | Sen. Joel Lourie [D] | Sen. Floyd Nicholson [D] |
Sen. William O'Dell [R] | Sen. Glenn Reese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-11-28 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-11-28 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4460 (Similar To) 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
H4442 (Similar To) 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
H4442 (Similar To) 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=1019&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/1019_20111128.htm |