SC H4442 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That It Is Unlawful For A Person Who Has A Legal Duty Of Care For A Child To Fail To Report To A Law Enforcement Agency Or Conceal The Death Or Disappearance Of The Child, And To Provide Penalties.
Title
Caylee's Law
Sponsors
Rep. Merita Allison [R] | Rep. Todd Atwater [R] | Rep. Kenneth Bingham [R] | Rep. Joan Brady [R] |
Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Deborah Long [R] | Rep. Peter McCoy [R] | Rep. Rick Quinn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-12 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy | |
2012-01-11 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brady | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-11-29 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4460 (Similar To) 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
S1019 (Similar To) 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
S1019 (Similar To) 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4442&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/4442_20111129.htm |