SC S0962 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Remove Provisions Concerning Certain Addiction Counselors; To Redesignate Chapter 75, Title 40 As "professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists, Addiction Counselors, And Psycho-educational Specialists", And To Redesignate Article 1, Chapter 75, Title 40 As "professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists, And Addiction Counselors".
Title
Addiction counselors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-10-18 |
2018-05-08 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-9-18 |
2018-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-0 |
2018-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-03 | House | Amended |
2018-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-3-18 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-04-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4601 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Act No. 249
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 75 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 190 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 285 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |