SC H4601 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 249
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 249
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Remove Provisions Concerning Certain Addiction Counselors; To Redesignate Chapter 75, Title 40 As "professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists, Addiction Counselors, And Psycho-educational Specialists", And To Redesignate Article 1, Chapter 75, Title 40 As "professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists, And Addiction Counselors"; And To Repeal Section 40-75-300 Relating To Licensure For Drug And Alcohol Counselors
Title
Addiction counselors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 249 | |
2018-05-30 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 256 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-2 |
2018-03-21 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-21 | House | Amended |
2018-03-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-21-18 |
2018-03-20 | House | Amended |
2018-03-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0962 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 75 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 190 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 285 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |