SC S0929 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specify Permit Requirements For Miniature Trains Operated For The Use Of The Public As An Amusement Device In An Amusement Park
Title
Benji's Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Act No. 129 | |
2012-03-16 | Effective date 03/13/12 | |
2012-03-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-03-07 | Ratified R 136 | |
2012-02-23 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-02-22 | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-22 | Read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Debate adjourned until Tues., 02-21-12 | |
2012-02-02 | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-06-02 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-06-01 | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 | |
2011-06-01 | Read second time | |
2011-05-31 | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-05-26 | Introduced and read first time |