SC S0919 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-7-110, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Beaufort County, So As To Add The New River, Palmetto Bluff, And Sandy Pointe Voting Precincts, To Update The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office, And To Correct An Outdated Reference To The Former Office Of Research And Statistics. - Ratified Title
Title
Voting precincts; Beaufort county
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Act No. 122 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2020-03-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-03-19 | Ratified R 124 | |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-63 Nays-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2020-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3784 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
H4499 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4499 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary