SC H4499 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-7-110, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Beaufort County, So As To Add The New River, Palmetto Bluff, And Sandy Pointe Voting Precincts, To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office, And To Correct An Outdated Reference To The Former Office Of Research And Statistics.
Title
Beaufort County voting precincts
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] | Rep. William Herbkersman [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] |
Rep. Michael Rivers [D] | Rep. Shedron Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 46) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-67 Nays-0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
H3784 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
S0919 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Act No. 122
S0919 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Act No. 122