SC S0918 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Referred to Subcommittee: J.Matthews (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Referred to Subcommittee: J.Matthews (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratify A Proposed Amendment To The Constitution Of The United States Of America Providing That Equality Of Rights Under The Law Must Not Be Denied Or Abridged On Account Of Sex.
Title
Equality of rights
Sponsors
Sen. Margie Matthews [D] | Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] | Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Sandra Senn [R] |
Sen. Thomas Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: J.Matthews (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0901 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Referred to Subcommittee: J.Matthews (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn
H3340 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
H3340 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0918&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/918_20191211.htm |