SC H3340 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratify A Proposed Amendment To The Constitution Of The United States Of America Providing That Equality Of Rights Under The Law Must Not Be Denied Or Abridged On Account Of Sex.
Title
Equality of rights
Sponsors
Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D] | Rep. Peter McCoy [R] | Rep. Mandy Norrell [D] | Rep. Seth Rose [D] |
Rep. Beth Bernstein [D] | Rep. William Cogswell [R] | Rep. Joseph Daning [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell |
2019-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0901 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Referred to Subcommittee: J.Matthews (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn
S0918 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Referred to Subcommittee: J.Matthews (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
S0918 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Referred to Subcommittee: J.Matthews (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3340&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3340_20181218.htm |