SC S0915 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Junction Of Cushman Drive And Baldwin Road In Richland County "deputy Darral Keith Lane, Sr. Memorial Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection Containing This Designation.
Title
Deputy Darral Keith Lane, Sr. Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced |