SC S0906 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 43-35-10(3) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Definition Of "exploitation" In The "omnibus Adult Protection Act", To Amend The Definition Of "exploitation" To Include The Exercise Of Extreme Undue Influence Over, Coercive Persuasion Of, Or Psychologically Damaging Manipulation Of A Vulnerable Adult; And To Further Amend Section 43-35-10 By Adding A Definition For "undue Influence".
Title
Omnibus Adult Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-05-11 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-05-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-11-22 |
2022-05-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3236 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel