SC S0885 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To Amend Article 1, Chapter 15, Title 50 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Nongame And Endangered Wildlife Species, By Adding Section 50 15 15, To Provide That It Is Unlawful For A Person To Sell, Purchase, Trade, Exchange, Barter, Export, Ship, Transfer The Possession Of, Re Home, Remove, Or Attempt To Remove From This State Any Native Reptile Or Amphibian Species And To Provide That The Department Of Natural Resources May Establish Possession Limits For Reptile And Amphibian Species By Regulation; To Amend Section 50-15-30(b) And (c) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Endangered Species Listed, To Make Technical Changes; To Amend Section 50-15-40(a), Relating To Establishing And Carrying Out Programs For The Management Of Nongame And Endangered Wildlife, To Make Technical Changes; To Amend Article 1, Chapter 15, Title 50 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Nongame And Endangered Wildlife Species, By Adding Section 50 15 55, To Provide That It Is Unlawful For Wildlife That Is Not Native To This State To Be Released From Captivity In This State And To Provide That The Department Of Natural Resources May Promulgate Regulations To Prohibit Or Otherwise Restrict Certain Species Of Non Native Wildlife In This State; To Amend Section 50-15-80 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Penalties, Searches And Seizures, The Power To Arrest, And The Disposition Of Confiscated Property, To Provide Penalties For The Sale, Purchase, Trade, Exchange, Barter, Export, Shipping, Transfer, Possession, Or Re Homing Of Any Native Reptile Or Amphibian Species And For The Release From Captivity In This State Of Wildlife That Is Not Native To This State, To Provide That The Magistrate's Court Has Concurrent Jurisdiction Over Such Violations, To Provide That A Violator Must Also Have Any Permits Issued By The Department Of Natural Resources Revoked And May Not Apply To Obtain Another Permit For A Certain Period Of Time; And To Define Necessary Terms.
Title
Native reptiles and amphibians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-01-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4831 (Similar To) 2020-10-07 - Act No. 177
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 15 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 15 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 15 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |