SC S0877 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Include Filing Claims Against Any Surety Bonds On Board-approved Forms In Accordance With Board-established Procedures
Title
Appraisal management company registration requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 197 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date 05/15/18 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 215 | |
2018-05-04 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-03 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0 |
2018-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-03 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-05-02 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-05-02 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |