SC S0862 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 63-13-30, Relating To Caregiver Requirements, So As To Provide For Educational And Pre-service Training Requirements.
Title
DSS - Childcare Center Caregiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-27 Nays-17 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |