SC S0758 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-6-240(b) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Continuing Education Requirements For Licensed Auctioneers, To Provide That A Licensee Who Is Sixty-five Years Old Or Older With Twenty-five Years Of Licensure May Apply For A Continuing Education Waiver.
Title
Auctioneers, continuing education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |