SC S0732 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require Secondary Metals Recyclers To Register With The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, And To Provide Registration And Renewal Requirements.
Title
Obtaining nonferrous metals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-02-22 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rose, Shoopman | |
2012-01-10 | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | |
2011-05-04 | Polled out of committee Judiciary | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Coleman, Davis, Nicholson | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-24 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3660 (Similar To) 2011-06-27 - Act No. 68
H4129 (Similar To) 2011-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4129 (Similar To) 2011-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 11 | 523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 680 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 685 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |