SC H3660 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Definitions For Certain New And Delete Certain Existing Terms, To Provide That A Secondary Metals Recycler, Shall Obtain A Permit To Purchase Nonferrous Metals From The Sheriff Of The County In Which A Secondary Metals Recycler's Fixed Site Is Located, To Provide That Certain Persons Who Want To Transport Or Sell Nonferrous Metals To A Secondary Metals Recycler Shall Obtain A Permit To Transport And Sell Nonferrous Metals From The Sheriff Of The County In Which The Person Resides Or Is Located, To Provide That It Is Unlawful To Obtain A Permit For The Purpose Of Transporting Or Selling Stolen Nonferrous Metals And To Provide A Penalty, To Revise The Provision That Provides That It Is Unlawful To Purchase Nonferrous Metals From A Person Who Is Not A Holder Of A Retail License By Providing That This Provision Applies To The Purchase Of Nonferrous Metals For The Purpose Of Recycling Them From A Seller Who Is Not A Holder Of A Resale License, An Authorized Wholesaler, Certain Contractor, Or Certain Utility, Plumbing, Electrical, Or Climate Conditioning Service Provider Under Certain Circumstances, To Revise The Provision That Requires A Secondary Metals Recycler To Maintain A Record Of Persons Who He Purchases Nonferrous Metals From, To Provide That A Secondary Metals Recycler Shall Purchase Copper, Catalytic Converters, And Beer Kegs By Check, To Provide That A Secondary Metals Recycler Shall Display Prominently A Sign At His Fixed Site That Provides The Conditions That Must Be Met By A Seller Before He May Purchase Nonferrous Metals From The Seller, To Provide New And Delete Certain Prior Penalties For Violations Of Provisions Of This Section, To Provide That This Section Preempts Local Ordinances And Regulations Governing The Transportation Of Certain Nonferrous Metals, And Delete The Provision That Provides That This Section Shall Not Preempt The Ability Of A Political Subdivision To Enact Ordinances Or Regulations Pertaining To Zoning Of Business License Fees; And To Repeal Section 16-17-685 Relating To The Unlawful Transportation Of Nonferrous Metals
Title
Nonferrous metals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Concur In House Amendments (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate: to concur in House Amendments (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 2 (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill As Amended (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 20 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House: Passage of Bill as amended (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 20 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate: to concur in House Amendments (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 2 (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill As Amended (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 20 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House: Passage of Bill as amended (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 20 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Act No. 68 | |
2011-06-22 | Effective date 08/17/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified R 102 | |
2011-06-15 | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 | |
2011-06-15 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Returned to Senate with amendments | |
2011-06-02 | Roll call Yeas-79 Nays-34 | |
2011-06-02 | Senate amendment amended | |
2011-06-01 | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-2 | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2011-06-01 | Amended | |
2011-05-31 | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-3 | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time | |
2011-05-11 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference | |
2011-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-05-04 | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-6 | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time | |
2011-05-04 | Requests for debate-Rep | |
2011-05-04 | Amended | |
2011-05-04 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson | |
2011-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-04-27 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Gilliard | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard, Butler Garrick | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4129 (Similar To) 2011-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0732 (Similar To) 2012-02-23 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0732 (Similar To) 2012-02-23 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 11 | 523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 680 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 685 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |