SC S0719 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 33-57-140, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Standards For Raffles Conducted By Nonprofit Organizations, So As To Increase The Maximum Fair Market Value Of An Individual Prize; To Amend Section 33-57-150, Relating To Allowable Expenses For A Raffle, So As To Adjust Certain Recording Requirements And Allow A Nonprofit Organization To Submit A Single Report For All Raffles Conducted; And To Repeal Section 33-57-200 Relating To The Repeal Of Chapter 57, Title 33. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raffles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-02 Act No. 148
2020-10-02 Effective date 09/28/20
2020-09-28 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 157
2020-09-22SenateOrdered enrolled for ratification
2020-09-22SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2020-09-22SenateConcurred in amendment
2020-09-22HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2020-09-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-09-16HouseRoll call Yeas-112 Nays-0
2020-09-16HouseRead second time
2020-09-16HouseAmended
2020-09-16HouseReconsidered
2020-09-15HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
2020-09-15HouseRead second time
2020-05-12HouseRecalled from Committee on Ways and Means
2020-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-03-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-10SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2020-03-10SenateRead second time
2020-03-10SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-03-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-04SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Massey, McElveen, Fanning, Loftis
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-28SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H4353 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile
H4937 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3357140(n/a)See Bill Text
3357150(n/a)See Bill Text
3357200(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0719&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/719_20190328.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/719_20200304.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/719_20200305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/719_20200310.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/719_20200311.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/719_20200512.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/719_20200916.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/719_20200922.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17579
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17832
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17835
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17934

Bill Comments

feedback