SC H4937 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 33-57-100, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Exceptions To The Prohibition On Lotteries And Raffles, So As To Clarify That Electronic Gaming Devices Are Prohibited; To Amend Section 33-57-110, Relating To Definitions, So As To Expand The Definition Of A "nonprofit Organization" To Include An Organization Recognized As Tax-exempt Under Internal Revenue Code Section 501(c)(5) And To Define The Term "electronic Gaming Device"; To Amend Section 33-57-120, As Amended, Relating To Raffles Conducted By Nonprofit Organizations, So As To Authorize Nonprofit Organizations Recognized As Tax-exempt Under Internal Revenue Code Section 501(c)(5) To Conduct A Raffle And To Remove The Prohibition On The Use Of Funds Raised By The Raffle To Purchase Athletic Equipment; To Amend Section 33-57-140, As Amended, Relating To Standards For Raffles, So As To Increase The Fair Market Value Of Individual Prize And Total Prize Limits; To Amend Section 33-57-150, Relating To Allowable Expenses And Records For A Raffle, So As To Provide What Must Be Contained In The Report To The Secretary, To Allow For The Submission Of One Report For A Nonprofit Organization With Affiliates Or Subsidiaries Under Certain Circumstances, And To Establish Certain Record Keeping Requirements; And To Repeal Section 33-57-200 Relating To The Repeal Of Chapter 57, Title 33.
Title
Raffles; authorize nonprofits to conduct raffle and remove certain prohibitions
Sponsors
Rep. Russell Fry [R] | Rep. Seth Rose [D] | Rep. William Hewitt [R] | Rep. Roger Kirby [D] |
Rep. Gary Clary [R] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] |
Rep. Brandon Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, B.Newton |
2020-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2020-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose, Hewitt, Kirby, Clary |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0719 (Similar To) 2020-10-02 - Act No. 148
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 57 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 57 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 57 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 57 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 57 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 57 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |