SC S0711 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish And Recognize The Blue Ridge Community In Greenville County And To Provide That The Blue Ridge Community Is Not A Governmental Entity And May Not Exercise Any Governmental Functions. - Ratified Title
Title
Blue Ridge-Greenbelt Community
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 108 | |
2021-06-22 | Effective date 06/15/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-06-09 | Ratified R 109 | |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2021-06-08 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-05-13 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-1 |
2021-05-13 | House | Read second time |
2021-05-13 | House | Amended |
2021-05-12 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Greenville Delegation |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Greenville Delegation |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |