SC S0699 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Impose An Inspection Fee Of One Dollar A Ton On The Distribution Or Sale Of Commercial Fertilizer In This State, To Provide That This Fee Must Be Reported, Paid, And Enforced In The Same Manner That The Existing Fifty Cents A Ton Inspection Tax On The Sale Of Commercial Fertilizer Is Reported, Paid, And Enforced, To Provide That The Revenues Of This Inspection Fee Must Be Retained And Expended By The Division Of Regulatory And Public Service Programs Of Clemson University (clemson Psa) For The Support Of The Division's Programs, And To Provide That Unexpended Fee Revenues At The End Of A Fiscal Year Carry Forward To The Succeeding Fiscal Year And Must Be Used For The Same Purposes
Title
Inspection fee on the distribution or sale of commercial fertilizer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 79 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Act No. 140 | |
2014-03-19 | Effective date 07/01/14 | |
2014-03-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-03-11 | Ratified R 139 | |
2014-03-05 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-79 Nays-26 |
2014-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2013-06-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-25 Nays-10 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-05-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Polled out of committee Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |