SC S0675 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 12-37-2460, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Property Tax Revenues From Certain Aircraft, So As To Credit The Proceeds Of Such Taxes To The State Aviation Fund; To Amend Section 55-5-280, Relating To The State Aviation Fund, So As To Phase In The Crediting Of The Property Tax Revenues From Aircraft; And To Provide That A Portion Of The Revenues Collected Must Be Used To Obtain Or Develop Certain Airport Facilities. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Airlines, crediting property tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Act No. 86
2021-06-01 Effective date 05/18/21
2021-05-18 Signed By Governor
2021-05-18 Ratified R 105
2021-05-13HouseRead third time and enrolled
2021-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-91 Nays-2
2021-05-12HouseRead second time
2021-05-11HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 5-12-21
2021-05-06HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 5-11-21
2021-05-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-04-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-04-07SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2021-04-07SenateRead second time
2021-04-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-04-01 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2021-03-16SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0360 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H3706 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12372460(n/a)See Bill Text
555280(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0675&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/675_20210316.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/675_20210331.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/675_20210401.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/675_20210407.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/675_20210408.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/675_20210504.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/675_20210505.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0675%202021-03-16%20introduced.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19119
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19661

Bill Comments 750

feedback