SC S0360 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-37-2460, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Crediting Property Taxes On Airlines, So As To Credit The Proceeds Of Taxes To The State Aviation Fund; And To Amend Section 55-5-280, Relating To The State Aviation Fund, So As To Phase-in The Crediting Of The Proceeds.
Title
Airlines, crediting property tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3706 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
S0675 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Act No. 86
S0675 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Act No. 86
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0360&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/360_20201209.htm |