SC S0655 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Recommitted to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Recommitted to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3360, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Job Tax Credit, So As To Provide For A Professional Sports Team; To Amend Section 4-9-30, Relating To The Designation Of Powers Under The Alternate Forms Of Government, So As To Prohibit The Levy Of County License Fees And Taxes On A Professional Sports Team; To Amend Section 5-7-30, Relating To Powers Of A Municipality, So As To Prohibit The Levy Of A Business License Tax On A Professional Sports Team; And By Adding Section 5-3-20 So As To Provide That The Real Property Owned By A Professional Sports Team May Not Be Annexed By A Municipality Without Prior Written Consent Of The Professional Sports Team.
Title
Professional sports team
Sponsors
Sen. Harvey Peeler [R] | Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] | Sen. Wes Climer [R] | Sen. Michael Fanning [D] |
Sen. Chauncey Gregory [R] | Sen. Hugh Leatherman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Finance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4243 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Act No. 83
S0309 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Conference committee appointed Simrill, Pope, Rutherford
S0309 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Conference committee appointed Simrill, Pope, Rutherford
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 6 | 3360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 9 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 3 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 7 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |