SC S0309 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Conference committee appointed Simrill, Pope, Rutherford
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Conference committee appointed Simrill, Pope, Rutherford
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To Amend Section 12 6 3360, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Job Tax Credit, So As To Provide For A Professional Sports Team; To Amend Section 4 9 30, Relating To The Designation Of Powers Under The Alternate Forms Of Government, So As To Prohibit The Levy Of County License Fees And Taxes On A Professional Sports Team; To Amend Section 5 7 30, Relating To Powers Of A Municipality, So As To Prohibit The Levy Of A Business License Tax On A Professional Sports Team; And By Adding Section 5 3 20 So As To Provide That The Real Property Owned By A Professional Sports Team May Not Be Annexed By A Municipality Without Prior Written Consent Of The Professional Sports Team.
Title
Industry Partnership Fund tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 107 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 22 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 22 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Conference committee appointed Simrill, Pope, Rutherford |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Gregory, Climer. Harpootlian |
2019-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-107 |
2019-05-09 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2019-05-09 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-23 |
2019-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-08 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-30 Nays-10 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Amended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3595 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Act No. 15
S0655 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Recommitted to Committee on Finance
H4243 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Act No. 83
S0655 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Recommitted to Committee on Finance
H4243 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Act No. 83