SC S0654 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Recognize September As "hunger Action Month" In South Carolina.
Title
Hunger Action Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-04-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Polled out of committee Medical Affairs |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |