SC S0640 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Massey, Cash
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To The Clerk Of Court Reporting The Disposition Of Each Case In The Court Of General Sessions, To Require Every Clerk Of Court To Report To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division Within Ten Days, Weekends And Holidays Excluded, The Disposition Of Each Case In General Sessions And To Report Within Forty-eight Hours The Issuance Of A Restraining Order, Order Of Protection, Order For The Prevention Of Possession Of A Firearm, Convictions Or Orders Related To Domestic Violence, And Convictions Or Orders Related To Stalking, Intimidation, Or Harassment; To Amend Chapter 1, Title 22 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Magistrates Generally, By Adding Section 22-1-200, To Require Magistrates To Report To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division Within Ten Days, Weekends And Holidays Excluded, The Disposition Of Each Criminal Case And To Report Within Forty-eight Hours The Issuance Of A Restraining Order, Order Of Protection, Order For The Prevention Of Possession Of A Firearm, Convictions Or Orders Related To Domestic Violence, And Convictions Or Orders Related To Stalking, Intimidation, Or Harassment; To Amend Article 1, Chapter 25, Title 14 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Municipal Courts, By Adding Section 14-25-250, To Require Magistrates To Report To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division Within Ten Days, Weekends And Holidays Excluded, The Disposition Of Each Criminal Case And To Report Within Forty-eight Hours The Issuance Of A Restraining Order, Order Of Protection, Order For The Prevention Of Possession Of A Firearm, Convictions Or Orders Related To Domestic Violence, And Convictions Or Orders Related To Stalking, Intimidation, Or Harassment; To Amend Chapter 1, Title 23 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Law Enforcement And Public Safety, By Adding Section 23-1-250, To Require Each Law Enforcement Agency To Report To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division Within Twenty-four Hours The Filing Of Each Incident Report, Order Of Protection, Restraining Order, Any Order Or Report Relating To An Incident Of Domestic Violence, Or Any Incident In Which A Person May Be Prohibited From Obtaining Or Possessing A Firearm By State Or Federal Law; And To Amend Title 14 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Courts, By Adding Chapter 32, To Create The Judicial Criminal Information Technology Committee And To Establish Its Membership, Duties, And Responsibilities, Including The Study Of And Recommendations For The Improvement Of Judicial And Law Enforcement Information Technology And Reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Magistrates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Massey, Cash
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0154 (Similar To) 2019-03-15 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Massey, Cash
S0341 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3248 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell, Stavrinakis, Sottile
H4212 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1417325(n/a)See Bill Text
1425250(n/a)See Bill Text
221200(n/a)See Bill Text
231250(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback