SC S0154 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Massey, Cash
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A Bill To Amend Section 14-17-325 Of The South Carolina Code Of Laws, 1976, Related To Clerks Of Court, To Require That Every Clerk Of Court Shall Report To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division Within Ten Days, Weekends And Holidays Excluded, The Disposition Of Each Case In General Sessions, And To Report Within Forty-eight Hours The Issuance Of A Restraining Order, Order Of Protection, Order For The Prevention Of Possession Of A Firearm, Convictions Or Orders Related To Domestic Violence, And Convictions Or Orders Related To Stalking, Intimidation, Or Harassment; To Amend Chapter 1, Title 22 By Adding Section 22-1-200 To Require Magistrates To Report To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division Within Ten Days, Weekends And Holidays Excluded, The Disposition Of Each Criminal Case, And To Report Within Forty-eight Hours The Issuance Of A Restraining Order, Order Of Protection, Order For The Prevention Of Possession Of A Firearm, Convictions Or Orders Related To Domestic Violence, And Convictions Or Orders Related To Stalking, Intimidation, Or Harassment; To Amend Article 1, Chapter 25, Title 14 By Adding Section 14-25-250 To Require Magistrates To Report To The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division Within Ten Days, Weekends And Holidays Excluded, The Disposition Of Each Criminal Case, And To Report Within Forty-eight Hours The Issuance Of A Restraining Order, Order Of Protection, Order For The Prevention Of Possession Of A Firearm, Convictions Or Orders Related To Domestic Violence, And Convictions Or Orders Related To Stalking, Intimidation, Or Harassment; To Amend Chapter 1, Title 23 By Adding Section 23-1-250 To Require Each Law Enforcement Agency To Report To Sled Within Twenty-four Hours, The Filing Of Each Incident Report, Order Of Protection, Restraining Order, Any Order Or Report Relating To An Incident Of Domestic Violence, Or Any Incident In Which A Person May Be Prohibited From Obtaining Or Possessing A Firearm By State Or Federal Law; To Amend Title 14 By Adding Chapter 32 To Create The Judicial Criminal Information Technology Committee, To Establish Membership, Duties, And Responsibilities Of The Committee To Include The Study Of, And To Make Recommendations For, The Improvement Of Judicial And Law Enforcement Information Technology And Reporting; To Amend Chapter 23, Title 16 By Adding Article 9, To Require That No Gun Transfer Preceded By A Criminal Background Check May Proceed, Unless The Criminal Background Check Has Concluded That The Sale May Proceed, Or Until At Least Five Days Have Passed From The Initiation Of The Background Check And The National Instant Criminal Background Check System Has Not Reported That The Sale Would Violate State Or Federal Law, And To Provide For Criminal Penalties For Violations Of This Article; And To Provide A Sunset For The Five-day Background Check Provisions Upon The Full Implementation Of The Reporting Requirements Of This Act But Not Later Than Two Years From The Effective Date Of The Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Magistrates and Clerks of Court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Massey, Cash
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), McElveen, Kimpson, Rice, Senn
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0341 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3248 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell, Stavrinakis, Sottile
H4212 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0640 (Similar To) 2019-03-15 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Massey, Cash

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1417325(n/a)See Bill Text
1425250(n/a)See Bill Text
221200(n/a)See Bill Text
231250(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback