SC S0620 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - Recommitted to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - Recommitted to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 12-51-50, Relating To Sales Of Property By A County Resulting From Delinquent Taxes, So As To Allow An Electronic Sale And To Provide For The Procedures Of An Electronic Sale; And By Amending Section 12-51-60, Relating To Payment By The Successful Bidder In A Tax Sale, So As To Provide For The Distribution Of Proceeds Derived From An Electronic Tax Sale.
Title
Electronic Tax Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |