SC S0602 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 1-30-35, Relating To The Composition And Governance Of The Department Of Disabilities And Special Needs, So As To Provide That The Department Shall Be Headed By A Director Who Is Appointed By The Governor Upon The Advice And Consent Of The Senate; By Amending Title 44 By Removing Chapter 20 And Inserting It Into Title 43; To Amend Chapter 20 To Eliminate The Commission As The Governing Body Of The Department; To Reenact The Establishment Of The Department And Its Powers And Duties; To Provide That The Department's Administrative Head Is A Director Appointed By The Governor With The Advice And Consent Of The Senate; To Transfer The Powers And Duties Vested In The Commission To The Director; To Transfer From The Commission Of The Department The Authority To Promulgate Regulations; To Make Conforming Changes; And To Define Necessary Terms; And By Repealing Chapter 20, Title 44.
Title
DDSN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |