SC S0542 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Enacting The "south Carolina Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy And Resilience Act"; And By Adding Chapter 39 To Title 6 So As To Provide Definitions, Create And Establish The Program, Provide For Application And Administration, Establish A Process For Assessing And Collecting Liens, Provide Financing, And To Develop Standards, Among Other Things.
Title
Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-05-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-04-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-04-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Finance |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3937 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby, Williams