SC S0541 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To The Child Protection And Permanency Definitions To Provide That A Child Victim Of Sex Trafficking Or Severe Forms Of Trafficking In Persons Is A Victim Of Child Abuse Or Neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abuse and neglect

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-22HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-21SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-20SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2018-03-20SenateRead second time
2018-03-14SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn, R.J.Cash
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H4094 (Similar To) 2018-03-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63720(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback