SC H4094 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Child Victim Of Sex Trafficking Or Severe Forms Of Trafficking In Persons Is A Victim Of Child Abuse Or Neglect.
Title
Abuse and neglect
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson |
2018-03-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2018-03-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis |
2018-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss, Atwater |
2018-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0541 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4094&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4094_20170404.htm |