SC S0530 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Responsibilities For The Department Of Administration; To Provide That The State Fiscal Accountability Authority Shall Publish Interim Regulations It Will Follow To Implement Certain Changes; To Repeal Section 11-35-1580 Relating To Information Technology Procurements; To Redesignate Article 10, Chapter 35, Title 11 As "indefinite Quantity Contracts"; And To Recodify Sections 11-35-35, Relating To Surety Bonds, 11-35-55, Relating To The Purchase Of Goods Or Services From An Entity Employing Prison Inmates, And 11-35-70, Relating To School Districts Subject To The Procurement Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 41
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/13/19
2019-05-13 Signed By Governor
2019-05-09 Ratified R 52
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-93 Nays-7
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-04-03HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-02SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-04-02SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-28SenateAmended
2019-03-27SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-03-27SenateRead second time
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
111190(n/a)See Bill Text
123600(n/a)See Bill Text
11351210(n/a)See Bill Text
11351230(n/a)See Bill Text
11351410(n/a)See Bill Text
11351510(n/a)See Bill Text
11351520(n/a)See Bill Text
11351525(n/a)See Bill Text
11351528(n/a)See Bill Text
11351529(n/a)See Bill Text
11351530(n/a)See Bill Text
11351535(n/a)See Bill Text
11351540(n/a)See Bill Text
11351550(n/a)See Bill Text
11351560(n/a)See Bill Text
11351570(n/a)See Bill Text
11351580(n/a)See Bill Text
11351610(n/a)See Bill Text
11351810(n/a)See Bill Text
11351830(n/a)See Bill Text
11351840(n/a)See Bill Text
113520(n/a)See Bill Text
11352015(n/a)See Bill Text
11352030(n/a)See Bill Text
11352040(n/a)See Bill Text
11352050(n/a)See Bill Text
1135210(n/a)See Bill Text
11352410(n/a)See Bill Text
11352420(n/a)See Bill Text
113527(n/a)See Bill Text
11353010(n/a)See Bill Text
11353015(n/a)See Bill Text
11353020(n/a)See Bill Text
11353023(n/a)See Bill Text
11353024(n/a)See Bill Text
11353030(n/a)See Bill Text
11353040(n/a)See Bill Text
11353070(n/a)See Bill Text
1135310(n/a)See Bill Text
11353220(n/a)See Bill Text
11353230(n/a)See Bill Text
11353305(n/a)See Bill Text
11353310(n/a)See Bill Text
11353320(n/a)See Bill Text
11353410(n/a)See Bill Text
113535(n/a)See Bill Text
11353820(n/a)See Bill Text
11353830(n/a)See Bill Text
11353840(n/a)See Bill Text
11353850(n/a)See Bill Text
113540(n/a)See Bill Text
1135410(n/a)See Bill Text
11354210(n/a)See Bill Text
11354215(n/a)See Bill Text
11354220(n/a)See Bill Text
11354230(n/a)See Bill Text
11354310(n/a)See Bill Text
11354315(n/a)See Bill Text
11354340(n/a)See Bill Text
11354410(n/a)See Bill Text
11354425(n/a)See Bill Text
11354430(n/a)See Bill Text
11354610(n/a)See Bill Text
11354810(n/a)See Bill Text
11354830(n/a)See Bill Text
11354840(n/a)See Bill Text
11354860(n/a)See Bill Text
11354870(n/a)See Bill Text
11354880(n/a)See Bill Text
11354900(n/a)See Bill Text
1135510(n/a)See Bill Text
1135530(n/a)See Bill Text
1135540(n/a)See Bill Text
113555(n/a)See Bill Text
113570(n/a)See Bill Text
1135710(n/a)See Bill Text
1135810(n/a)See Bill Text
1135820(n/a)See Bill Text
571490(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback