SC S0524 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Corrections Or Detention Facility Is Considered A Public Place, And To Provide That If The Violation Occurs Within A Corrections Or Detention Facility, The Sentence Is To Run Consecutively.
Title
Indecent exposure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-0 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Amended |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Bennett, Hembree, Johnson, Thurmond |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |