SC S0506 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 44-1-143 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Requirements For Home-based Food Production Operations, To Expand The Types Of Nonpotentially Hazardous Foods That May Be Sold To Include All Nonpotentially Hazardous Foods, To Allow For Direct Sales To Retail Stores, To Allow For Online And Mail Order Direct-to-consumer Sales, To Allow Home-based Food Production Operators To Provide On Their Labels An Identification Number Provided By The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, At The Operator's Request, In Lieu Of Their Addresses, And To Provide Penalties For Violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home-based food products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-03-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-03-10SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2021-03-10SenateRead second time
2021-03-10SenateAmended
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-02SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-02-03SenateCommitted to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-02-03SenateRecalled from Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
441143(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback