SC S0498 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 9, Chapter 11, Title 63 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The South Carolina Children's Trust Fund, By Adding Section 63-11-970, To Provide That The Children's Trust Fund Shall Have Access At Any And All Reasonable Times To All Electronic Information Systems, Records, Reports, And Materials Maintained By The Department Of Social Services In Certain Circumstances; And To Amend Section 63-7-1990(b), Relating To Confidentiality And The Release Of Records And Information, To Provide That The Department Of Social Services Is Authorized To Grant Access To The Records Of Indicated Cases To The Children's Trust Fund Of South Carolina.
Title
Children's Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |