SC S0481 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 23-9-10 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Transfer Of The Division Of The State Fire Marshal To The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation And The State Fire Marshal's Duties And Responsibilities, To Delete Certain Obsolete Language, To Make Technical Changes, And To Provide The Division Of Fire And Life Safety's Program Areas; To Amend Section 23-9-20 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Duties Of The State Fire Marshal, To Revise His Duties And Responsibilities; To Amend Section 23-9-25(f)(2) And (5) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Volunteer Strategic Assistance And Fire Equipment Program, To Revise Grant Application And Funding Procedures; To Amend Section 23-9-30 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Resident Fire Marshals, To Revise Their Duties And Who May Exercise These Duties And To Provide That The State Fire Marshal May Promulgate Regulations Regarding A Fire Marshal's Training And Certification; To Amend Section 23-9-45 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Issuance Of A Class D Fire Equipment Dealer License Or A Fire Equipment Permit, To Provide For The Issuance Of Additional Classes Of Licenses And Qualifications To Obtain These Licenses; To Amend Section 23-9-50 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The State Fire Marshal's Authority To Inspect Certain Buildings And Premises, To Revise The Circumstances Upon Which He May Enter A Building Or Premises; To Amend Chapter 10, Title 23 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The "south Carolina Fire Academy", To Make Technical Changes; To Amend Section 23-49-120(b) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The South Carolina Forestry Commission's Acceptance Of Donations Of Fire Equipment, To Provide That The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Division Of Fire And Life Safety Also May Accept Donations Of Fire Equipment; To Amend Section 40-80-30(d) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To A Firefighter Registering With The State Fire Marshal, To Revise The Cost And Process Of Obtaining Certain Individual Fighter Records; And To Repeal Sections 23-9-35, 23-9-40, 23-9-60, 23-9-110, And 23-9-130 Of The 1976 Code, All Relating To Duties Of The State Fire Marshal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighter registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-12SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-03-11SenateRead second time
2020-03-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-10SenateAmended
2020-03-10SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-29 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3178 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2349120(n/a)See Bill Text
23910(n/a)See Bill Text
239110(n/a)See Bill Text
239130(n/a)See Bill Text
23920(n/a)See Bill Text
23925(n/a)See Bill Text
23930(n/a)See Bill Text
23935(n/a)See Bill Text
23940(n/a)See Bill Text
23945(n/a)See Bill Text
23950(n/a)See Bill Text
23960(n/a)See Bill Text
408030(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback