SC H3178 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 23-9-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Transfer Of The Division Of State Fire Marshal To The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation And The State Fire Marshal's Duties And Responsibilities, So As To Delete Certain Obsolete Language, To Make Technical Changes, And To Provide The Division Of Fire And Life Safety Program Areas; To Amend Section 23-9-20, Relating To The Duties Of The State Fire Marshal, So As To Revise His Duties And Responsibilities; To Amend Section 23-9-25, Relating To The Volunteer Strategic Assistance And Fire Equipment Program, So As To Revise Grant Application And Funding Procedures; To Amend Section 23-9-30, Relating To Resident Fire Marshals, So As To Revise Their Duties And Who May Exercise These Duties, And Provide That The State Fire Marshal May Promulgate Regulations Regarding A Fire Marshal's Training And Certification; To Amend Section 23-9-45, Relating To The Issuance Of A Class D Fire Equipment Dealer License Or A Fire Equipment Permit, So As To Provide For The Issuance Of Additional Classes Of Licenses And Qualifications To Obtain These Licenses; To Amend Section 23-9-50, Relating To The State Fire Marshal's Authority To Inspect Certain Buildings And Premises, So As To Revise The Circumstances Upon Which He May Enter A Building Or Premise; To Amend The Title Of Chapter 10, Title 23, Relating To The "south Carolina Fire Academy" So As To Revise The Title To Read "south Carolina State Fire Academy"; To Amend Section 23-10-10, Relating To The Operation Of The South Carolina Fire Academy, So As To Make Technical Changes; To Amend Section 23-49-120, Relating To The South Carolina Forestry Commission Acceptance Of Donations Of Fire Equipment, So As To Provide That The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Division Of Fire And Life Safety Also May Accept Donations Of Fire Equipment Pursuant To This Provision; To Amend Section 40-80-30, Relating To A Firefighter Registering With The State Fire Marshal So As To Revises The Cost And Process Of Obtaining Certain Individual Fighter Records; And To Repeal Sections 23-9-35, 23-9-40, 23-9-60, 23-9-110, And 23-9-130 All Relating To Duties Of The State Fire Marshal.
Title
Firefighter registration
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Ridgeway [D] | Rep. Bruce Bannister [R] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
Rep. William Hixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0481 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 10 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 49 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 80 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3178&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3178_20181218.htm |