SC S0475 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Remove The Current Members Of The Board Of Trustees Of South Carolina State University And Devolve The Board's Powers Upon A New Appointed Board, To Specify The Members Of The New Board, To Provide Additional Powers To The New Board, And To Provide That The New Board Shall Serve Until July 1, 2018, At Which Time Another Board Shall Be Elected In The Same Manner As The Current Board Was Elected.
Title
South Carolina State University
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-03-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Special order, set for March 3, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Education |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Education |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |