SC S0458 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Sections 44-53-190(b) And 44-53-370(e) Of The 1976 Code, Relating In Part To The Trafficking Offenses For Certain Controlled Substances, To Add An Offense For "trafficking In Fentanyl", And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances, trafficking offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-03-02SenateAmended
2022-03-01SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2022-03-01SenateRead second time
2022-03-01SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2022-02-23SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2022-02-11SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), McLeod, Rice, Senn, Adams
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3367 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4453190(n/a)See Bill Text
4453370(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback