SC S0450 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 17 In Charleston County From A Point One And One-quarter Miles East Of Old Jacksonboro Road To Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 7 "curtis B. Inabinett, Sr. Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
Curtis B. Inabinett, Sr. Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |