SC S0449 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 4 Of Act 71 Of 2021, Relating To The Transportation Of Live Swine Without Identification, So As To Repeal The Sunset Clause. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Feral Hog Sunset Strike

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-25 Act No. 28
2023-05-25 Effective date 05/16/23
2023-05-16 Signed By Governor
2023-05-11 Ratified R 35
2023-05-03HouseRead third time and enrolled
2023-05-02HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-2
2023-05-02HouseRead second time
2023-04-26HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2023-02-23HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2023-02-23HouseIntroduced and read first time
2023-02-21SenateRead third time and sent to House
2023-02-16SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2023-02-16SenateRead second time
2023-02-16SenateAmended
2023-02-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-02-09SenateCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback