SC S0412 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Provisions Of The South Carolina Community Economic Development Act Until June 30, 2027.
Title
Community development corporations and financial institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3842 (Similar To) 2018-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith