SC H3842 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Provisions Of The South Carolina Community Economic Development Act Until June 30, 2027.
Title
Tax Credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2018-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis |
2018-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hosey |
2017-04-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0412 (Similar To) 2018-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3842&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3842_20170223.htm |