SC S0398 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide A Grace Period On The Enforcement Of Section 12-21-735 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Stamp Tax On Cigarettes, Against Unstamped Packages Of Cigarettes For Which Applicable Taxes Have Been Paid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarette stamp tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-14SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-02-13SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2019-02-13SenateRead second time
2019-02-13SenateAmended
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-02-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3849 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Effective date 03/20/19

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1221735(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback