SC H3849 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide A Grace Period On The Enforcement Of Section 12-21-735 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Stamp Tax On Cigarettes, Against Unstamped Packages Of Cigarettes For Which Applicable Taxes Have Been Paid. - Ratified Title
Title
Cigarette stamp tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 97 | |
2019-03-27 | Effective date 03/20/19 | |
2019-03-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Ratified R 20 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-02-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0398 (Similar To) 2019-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means