SC S0364 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Interchange Located At Exit 216a In Charleston County Along Interstate Highway 26 "reverend Dr. Willie E. Givens, Jr. Interchange" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Interchange Containing These Words.
Title
Reverend Dr. Willie E Givens, Jr. Interchange
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |