SC S0351 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Scott, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Scott, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Include, As A Requirement, Registration As A Member Of A Certified Political Party And To Provide A Procedure For Changing Political Party Affiliation Or Nonaffiliation After A Selection Has Been Made.
Title
Voter registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Scott, Young |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3087 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 5 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 9 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |